Global Patent Index - EP 1050098 A1

EP 1050098 A1 2000-11-08 - MODULAR ACTUATOR, AND BRAKE CALLIPER COMPRISING SUCH ACTUATOR

Title (en)

MODULAR ACTUATOR, AND BRAKE CALLIPER COMPRISING SUCH ACTUATOR

Title (de)

MODULARE BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, SOWIE BREMSSATTEL MIT EINER SOLCHEN BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

VERIN MODULAIRE ET ETRIER DE FREIN LE COMPORTANT

Publication

EP 1050098 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98900769 A

Priority

NL 9800033 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937010A1] An actuator comprises a housing, a motor (5), an actuating member (60) and a screw mechanism providing (2) a linear movement of the actuating member (60) with respect to the housing in response to a rotational movement of the motor (5), which screw mechanism (2) comprises a screw (61) and a nut (62) one of which is rotatably supported with respect to the housing by means of an angular contact bearing (14), and a reduction gear means (63). The actuating member (60) and the reduction gear means (63) are situated at opposite ends of the screw mechanism (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02K 7/06; F16D 65/16; F16H 25/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16D 65/18 (2006.01); F16D 65/14 (2006.01); F16D 65/16 (2006.01); F16H 25/20 (2006.01); H02K 7/06 (2006.01); F16D 55/00 (2006.01); F16D 66/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02K 7/06 (2013.01); F16D 65/18 (2013.01); F16H 25/20 (2013.01); F16D 2055/0091 (2013.01); F16D 2066/003 (2013.01); F16D 2121/24 (2013.01); F16D 2125/40 (2013.01); F16D 2125/48 (2013.01); F16D 2125/50 (2013.01); F16H 25/2204 (2013.01); F16H 25/2252 (2013.01); F16H 2025/2075 (2013.01); F16H 2025/2087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937010A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937010 A1 19990722; AU 5578698 A 19990802; CN 1179466 C 20041208; CN 1285088 A 20010221; DE 69810512 D1 20030206; DE 69810512 T2 20031002; EP 1050098 A1 20001108; EP 1050098 B1 20030102; ES 2190056 T3 20030716; JP 2002510020 A 20020402; US 6367592 B1 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080120

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070122

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2008-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070122

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070519

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070120

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070120

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060117

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190056 T3

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810512 P 20030206

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: 20030102

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010315

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT