Global patent index - EP 1050149 A1

EP 1050149 A1 2000-11-08 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PREVENTION OF ACCIDENTAL ACTIVATION OF KEYS IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PREVENTION OF ACCIDENTAL ACTIVATION OF KEYS IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERHINDERUNG DER UNABSICHTLICHEN TASTENAKTIVIERUNG IN EINEM SCHNURLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR PREVENIR L'ACTIVATION ACCIDENTELLE DES TOUCHES DANS UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL

Publication

EP 1050149 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902384 A

Priority

  • US 9901146 W
  • US 978598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937077A1] A wireless communication device has one or more predetermined patterns of key operation that are required to perform the function associated with the key. For example, activation of a power key on (114) a wireless communication device may be intentional or inadvertent. The wireless communication device requires activation of the selected key with a predetermined pattern of operation in order to qualify as an intentional act by the user. The predetermined patterns of operation may be varied in accordance with different conditions of the wireless communication device. The predetermined pattern of operation may require continuous activation for a predetermined period of time, multiple activation of the selected key within a predetermined period of time, simultaneous activation of multiple keys, sequential activation of multiple keys, or the like. The wireless communication device may also utilize a display to request confirmation by the user of a selected action.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 1/72; H04M 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/02 (2006.01); H04M 1/725 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/7258 (2013.01); H04M 1/0214 (2013.01); H04N 5/23241 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937077A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937077 A1 19990722; AU 2237999 A 19990802; BR 9907004 A 20001024; CA 2316913 A1 19990722; CN 1288631 A 20010321; EP 1050149 A1 20001108; IL 137242 D0 20010724; JP 2002510169 A 20020402; NO 20003699 A 20000915; NO 20003699 D0 20000719; RU 2000121961 A 20020727

INPADOC legal status

2007-08-31 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1034152

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-12-28 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18D

- Effective date: 20050816

2005-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050814

2005-03-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050204

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE