Global patent index - EP 1050162 A1

EP 1050162 A1 2000-11-08 - FORMAT AND FRAME RATE COMVERSION FOR DISPLAY OF 24 HZ SOURCE VIDEO

Title (en)

FORMAT AND FRAME RATE COMVERSION FOR DISPLAY OF 24 HZ SOURCE VIDEO

Title (de)

UMWANDLUNG VON FORMAT UND BILDFREQUENZ FÜR DIE ANZEIGE EINER 24 HZ QUELLE

Title (fr)

CONVERSION DE FREQUENCE DE TRAME ET DE FORMAT POUR AFFICHAGE D'UNE SOURCE VIDEO DE 24 Hz

Publication

EP 1050162 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964925 A

Priority

  • US 9827542 W
  • US 159697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9934597A1] An apparatus for electronic format and frame rate conversion in a multiple format video processing system adapted to avoid display motion artifacts causes by 3:2 video source by tripling the frame rate of the source video (312) and responsively adjusting the format of the resultant video signal (308).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/01 (2006.01); H04N 7/26 (2006.01); H04N 7/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/0105 (2013.01); H04N 7/0112 (2013.01); H04N 19/186 (2014.11); H04N 19/428 (2014.11); H04N 19/61 (2014.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934597 A1 19990708; AU 2014199 A 19990719; EP 1050162 A1 20001108; EP 1050162 A4 20030528; JP 2002500480 A 20020108; JP 4928666 B2 20120509

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20061027

2005-08-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEDIATEK INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040413

2003-05-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030410

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL