Global Patent Index - EP 1050174 A2

EP 1050174 A2 2000-11-08 - MOBILE RADIO TELEPHONE FOR MULTI-MODE OPERATION AND THE USE OF A RELAY STATION FOR SUCH MOBILE RADIO TELEPHONES

Title (en)

MOBILE RADIO TELEPHONE FOR MULTI-MODE OPERATION AND THE USE OF A RELAY STATION FOR SUCH MOBILE RADIO TELEPHONES

Title (de)

MOBILFUNKTELEFON FÜR MULTI-MODE-BETRIEB UND VERWENDUNG EINER RELAISSTATION FÜR DERARTIGE MOBILFUNKTELEFONE

Title (fr)

RADIOTELEPHONE MOBILE POUR FONCTIONNEMENT MULTIMODE ET UTILISATION D'UNE STATION RELAIS POUR CE TYPE DE RADIOTELEPHONES

Publication

EP 1050174 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98912203 A

Priority

  • DE 9800364 W
  • DE 19704907 A
  • DE 19707833 A
  • DE 19745350 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9835515A2] Multi-mode mobile radio telephones work in an least two operating modes. One such mode is operation in a public mobile radio network (GSM network). The second operating mode is a private, local operation according to the DECT standard for cordless telephones. The second operating mode is so configured that the devices can identify each other by incorporating the respective mobile radio telephone call numbers, which are allocated to said devices by the SIM card for the first operating mode. This makes it possible to establish local, private connections in which only one party is required to form part of the subscriber group, specially only the called subscriber. Furthermore, direct (peer to peer) connections are provided between subscribers without using the mobile radio network.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/32; H04M 1/72; H04Q 7/22; H04Q 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04M 1/725 (2006.01); H04W 4/24 (2009.01); H04W 84/08 (2009.01); H04W 88/06 (2009.01); H04W 16/26 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 84/08 (2013.01); H04B 7/155 (2013.01); H04B 7/2606 (2013.01); H04M 1/72519 (2013.01); H04M 15/8044 (2013.01); H04W 4/24 (2013.01); H04W 88/06 (2013.01); H04M 2215/32 (2013.01); H04M 2215/42 (2013.01); H04M 2215/745 (2013.01); H04W 16/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9835515A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9835515 A2 19980813; WO 9835515 A3 19981119; AU 6717098 A 19980826; EP 1050174 A2 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-02-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031209

2001-02-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE