Global Patent Index - EP 1050189 A1

EP 1050189 A1 2000-11-08 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR VOICE COMMUNICATIONS

Title (en)

METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR VOICE COMMUNICATIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR SPRACHKOMMUNIKATION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION VOCALE

Publication

EP 1050189 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99900900 A

Priority

  • FI 9900041 W
  • FI 980140 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938355A1] The present invention concerns a method and an arrangement for connecting a microphone requiring a bias voltage to an audio device for establishing voice signal communications therebetween, wherein the interface comprises several inputs for the microphone. The inventive method comprises steps of supplying a biasing voltage to the microphone through at least one of said several inputs for the microphone such that the biasing voltage is conducted through a diode which is disposed on a respective one of the conduits from said inputs, and transmitting the voice signal from the microphone to the audio device through another input of said several inputs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 3/00; G06F 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938355A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938355 A1 19990729; AU 2056599 A 19990809; BR 9907155 A 20001024; CN 1288648 A 20010321; CN 1319411 C 20070530; DE 69916423 D1 20040519; DE 69916423 T2 20050519; EP 1050189 A1 20001108; EP 1050189 B1 20040414; FI 105379 B 20000731; FI 980140 A0 19980122; FI 980140 A 19990723

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150121

2015-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150121

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69916423

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-04-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-07-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040725

2004-07-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916423 P 20040519

2004-05-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL)

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB SE

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021211

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB SE