Global Patent Index - EP 1050190 A1

EP 1050190 A1 2000-11-08 - ACTIVE ACOUSTIC DEVICES COMPRISING PANEL MEMBERS

Title (en)

ACTIVE ACOUSTIC DEVICES COMPRISING PANEL MEMBERS

Title (de)

AKTIVE AKUSTISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN MIT PLATTENFÖRMIGEN ELEMENTEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIFS ACOUSTIQUES ACTIFS A PANNEAU

Publication

EP 1050190 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99901055 A

Priority

  • GB 9900143 W
  • GB 9801057 A
  • GB 9801054 A
  • GB 9811100 A
  • GB 9813293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937121A1] Active acoustic device comprises a panel member (11) having distribution of resonant modes of bending wave action determining acoustic performance in conjunction with transducer means (31-34). The transducer means (31-34) is coupled to the panel member (11) at a marginal position. The arrangement is such as to result in acoustically acceptable action dependent on said distribution of active said resonant modes. Methods of selecting the transducer location, or improvement by location of localised marginal clamping, rely on assessing best or better operative interaction of said transducer means (31-34) and the panel members (11) according to parameters of acoustic output for the device as an acoustic radiator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 7/06; H04R 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 17/00 (2006.01); H04R 7/04 (2006.01); H04R 7/06 (2006.01); H04R 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 7/045 (2013.01); H04R 2440/05 (2013.01); H04R 2499/15 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937121A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937121 A1 19990722; AR 014430 A1 20010228; AT 280482 T 20041115; AU 2068199 A 19990802; AU 747693 B2 20020516; BG 104543 A 20010131; BR 9907145 A 20001024; CA 2318292 A1 19990722; CN 1287766 A 20010314; CN 1287766 B 20100623; DE 69839134 D1 20080327; DE 69839134 T2 20090212; DE 69921295 D1 20041125; DE 69921295 T2 20060209; DE 69921295 T8 20060706; EA 200000781 A1 20001225; EP 1050190 A1 20001108; EP 1050190 B1 20041020; EP 1414266 A2 20040428; EP 1414266 A3 20060816; EP 1414266 B1 20080213; HK 1029247 A1 20050311; HU 0102858 A2 20011228; HU 0102858 A3 20030328; IL 136820 D0 20010614; JP 2002510182 A 20020402; JP 4173283 B2 20081029; NO 20003705 A 20000920; NO 20003705 D0 20000719; NZ 504133 A 20020328; PL 341377 A1 20010409; SK 10822000 A3 20001211; TR 200002108 T2 20001121; TW 432889 B 20010501; YU 36800 A 20020318

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69921295

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-08-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130801

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120206

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050320

2005-11-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-11 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029247

2005-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-01-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-01-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-01-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: NEW TRANSDUCERS LIMITED

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69921295 P 20041125

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-11-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NEW TRANSDUCERS LIMITED

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2004-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO SI

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-10-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010621

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000719;SI PAYMENT 20000719