Global patent index - EP 1050193 A1

EP 1050193 A1 2000-11-08 - INFRARED HEATERS AND ELEMENTS THEREFOR

Title (en)

INFRARED HEATERS AND ELEMENTS THEREFOR

Title (de)

INFRAROT HEIZKÖRPER UND ELEMENTE DAFÜR

Title (fr)

RADIATEURS INFRAROUGE ET ELEMENTS POUR CELA

Publication

EP 1050193 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98962636 A

Priority

  • GB 9803916 W
  • GB 9727492 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2332844A] A heating element for an infra-red heater is made from an elongate strip 1 of sheet metal such as nickel chrome. The strip 1 has a varying cross-sectional area along its length, in order to provide an electrically resistive heating effect which varies along the length of the element. The area may be varied by having a non-uniform width of thickness, or by providing apertures (7, see figure 7) along the strip. The heater may be used to heat articles positioned on a conveyor belt 14.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/46; F24C 7/02; H05B 6/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/46 (2006.01); H05B 3/00 (2006.01); H05B 3/02 (2006.01); H05B 3/10 (2006.01); H05B 3/12 (2006.01); H05B 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/24 (2013.01); H05B 3/009 (2013.01); H05B 3/12 (2013.01); H05B 2203/032 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934645A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FI FR GB IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2332844 A 19990630; GB 9727492 D0 19980225; AU 1776099 A 19990719; CA 2317006 A1 19990708; DE 69811124 D1 20030306; DE 69811124 T2 20050512; EP 1050193 A1 20001108; EP 1050193 B1 20030129; JP 2002500426 A 20020108; NZ 505432 A 20020328; WO 9934645 A1 19990708

INPADOC legal status

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051224

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051224

2004-11-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041117

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041111

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041029

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-12-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-04-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69811124

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FI FR GB IE IT NL SE

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-01-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010423

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FI FR GB IE IT NL SE