Global Patent Index - EP 1050224 A2

EP 1050224 A2 2000-11-08 - Hook for shoes or similar articles

Title (en)

Hook for shoes or similar articles

Title (de)

Haken für Schuhe oder ähnliche Gegenstände

Title (fr)

Crochet pour chaussures ou pour articles similaires

Publication

EP 1050224 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830328 A

Priority

IT FI990053 U

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a hook for shoes or similar articles, consisting of a first portion (2) for fixing the hook to the vamp, and a second portion (3) featuring a channel (39) which allows a shoestring to pass through it ; the hook (1) is provided with means for linking the first portion (2) with the second portion (3), allowing the hook (1) to assume at least a first operational configuration, in which the two portions substantially lie on the same plane (2, 3) as well as a second operational configuration, in which said two portions form an angle ((); the second portion (3) features a seat (39) providing an open channel which is closed when the hook (1) is positioned in the above first configuration. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 3/00; A43C 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43C 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050224 A2 20001108; EP 1050224 A3 20031022; EP 1050224 B1 20050622; AT 298212 T 20050715; DE 60020906 D1 20050728; IT 247851 Y1 20020910; IT FI990053 U1 20001106; IT FI990053 V0 19990505

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120505

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060323

2005-11-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051129

2005-09-23 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-07-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60020906 P 20050728

2005-06-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT PT

2005-06-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050622

2004-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT PT

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040406

2004-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040202

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 43C 3/00 A

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 43C 3/04 B

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI