Global patent index - EP 1050227 A1

EP 1050227 A1 2000-11-08 - Machine for the reciprocal fastening of facing edges of the instep part of a shoe upper

Title (en)

Machine for the reciprocal fastening of facing edges of the instep part of a shoe upper

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verschnüren der Oberlederteilen von Schuhen im Ristbereich

Title (fr)

Machine pour lacer les quartiers de chaussures dans la région du coup de pied

Publication

EP 1050227 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99120092 A

Priority

  • EP 99120092 A
  • EP 99108539 A

Abstract (en)

A machine fastens to each other the opposite edges (51a,51b) of the instep part of a shoe upper by a piece (15) of thread (2) that is introduced in the holes (52a,52b) made in the edges and clamped at the related ends (15a,15b) by a cylindrical element (36) which receives these adjacent parts and is deformed permanently thus locking the ends (15a,15b) of the thread. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43D 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43D 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43D 11/085 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050227 A1 20001108

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040310

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030407

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010424

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI