Global Patent Index - EP 1050229 A1

EP 1050229 A1 2000-11-08 - Case

Title (en)

Case

Title (de)

Etui

Title (fr)

Etui

Publication

EP 1050229 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99108361 A

Priority

EP 99108361 A

Abstract (en)

The small case (10) has a container (12), double lid and fastening. The double lid consists of an inner lid (30) linked to t front top edge (24) of the container. An outer lid (40) is linked to the opposite back top edge (22) of the container. An inner insertion element (36) on the inner lid engages with an outer insertion element (46) on the outer lid to form the fastening. The inner insertion element has at least one inner raised part with edge. The opposite insertion element (46) has at least one reces facing the raised part with matching edge (47).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Etui, insbesondere auf ein Schmucketui für Ringe, Ketten, Ohrringe, Armbänder, Uhren oder für Accesoires aller Art, wie Schlüsselanhänger, Feuerzeuge, Krawattenringe und dergleichen. Sie bestehen im wesentlichen aus einem Behälter, auf den ein Deckel aufgesetzt ist, und einen Deckelverschluß. Als neuer Deckelverschluß ist ein Doppeldeckel vorgesehen, bestehend aus einem Innendeckel (30), der an einer vorderen Oberkante (24) der Vorderseite (20) angelenkt ist, und einem darauf gesetzten Außendeckel (40) mit einer Aussparung (46), die mit einem darunterliegenden Erhöhungsbereich (36) in Verschluß-Eingriff gelangen kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 11/16; A45C 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/00 (2006.01); A45C 13/10 (2006.01); A45C 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/10 (2013.01); A45C 11/00 (2013.01); A45C 13/126 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050229 A1 20001108; EP 1050229 B1 20020213; AT 213129 T 20020215; DE 59900862 D1 20020321; HK 1032514 A1 20020426

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-03-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-03-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: E. WILHELM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: E. WILHELM GMBH ETUIFABRIK, 77933 LAHR, DE

- Document: DE 59900862

- Effective date: 20120206

2012-02-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900862

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020419

2002-05-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-05-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900862 20020321

2002-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-02-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-02-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 213129 T 20020215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010111

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI