Global Patent Index - EP 1050230 A1

EP 1050230 A1 2000-11-08 - Opening support for a chest

Title (en)

Opening support for a chest

Title (de)

Hochstellstütze für eine Möbeltruhe

Title (fr)

Soutien couvercle pour un bahut

Publication

EP 1050230 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106820 A

Priority

  • DE 19920910 A
  • DE 19950970 A

Abstract (en)

The prop for a furniture chest with a lid-holder (20.1) fixed on the lid's (10) inner side, and a wall-holder (21.2) joined the main chest body The lid and wall-holder are joined by a support (22.1) which secures the lid in its flapped-up position, The support has a spring holder (22.2)with a spring element (22.8). When the lid is flapped to, an adjustment (23.1) is pre-tensione the spring against the spring element on a guide (22.3) between the two flap-positions of the lid. The lid and wall-holder are connected to the spring holder by means of swivel bearings (20.5,21.5)

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Hochstellstütze für eine Möbeltruhe mit einem Deckelhalter (20.1), der an der Deckelinnenseite (11) eines Truhendeckels (10) befestigt ist, und einem Wandhalter (21.1), der an dem Truhenkorpus (12) angekoppelt ist, wobei der Deckel- und der Wandhalter mittels einer Stützvorrichtung (22.1) verbunden sind, die den Truhendeckel in der aufgeklappten Stellung sichert. Zur Verbesserung der Bediensicherheit ist vorgesehen, daß die Stützvorrichtung einen Federhalter (22.2) mit einem Federelement (22.8) aufweist, daß in der zugeklappten Stellung des Truhendeckels ein Stellglied (23.1) gegen das Federelement federvorgespannt an einer Führung (22.3) zwischen den beiden Klappstellungen des Truhendeckels verschiebbar ist, und daß der Deckel- und der Wandhalter mittels Schwenklagerungen (20.5,21.5) an den Federhalter angekoppelt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 13/34; E05F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/34 (2006.01); E05F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/34 (2013.01); E05F 1/1058 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/686 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/602 (2013.01); Y10T 16/286 (2013.01); Y10T 16/299 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050230 A1 20001108; US 6557300 B1 20030506

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101001

2007-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071116

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK GB SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI