Global Patent Index - EP 1050237 A3

EP 1050237 A3 2001-05-16 - Combined scraper with brush

Title (en)

Combined scraper with brush

Title (de)

Kratzer- und Bürsten- Kombination

Title (fr)

Racloir et brosse combinés

Publication

EP 1050237 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00303582 A

Priority

US 30672399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1050237A2] A scraper (24) combined with a brush (26) including a shaft (20) having a handle (22), a scraper (24) attached to the shaft (20), a brush (26) attached to the shaft (20), and an adjustment mechanism provided between the brush (26) and the shaft (20) for adjusting an angular position of the brush with respect to the shaft (40). The adjustment mechanism includes a spring (118) that biases the brush (26) towards the shaft (20) thereby engaging complementary and opposing protrusions and recesses (48) located on the brush (26) and the shaft (20). The adjustment mechanism further includes an actuator (130) that is configured to have a locked position, in which the protrusions and recesses (48) are engaged, and an unlocked position, in which the actuator forced the protrusions and the recesses (48) to disengage by moving the brush (26) away from the shaft (20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 17/08; A46B 5/00; A46B 15/00; B60S 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 5/00 (2006.01); A46B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 5/0083 (2013.01); A46B 5/0075 (2013.01); A46B 15/0055 (2013.01); A46B 15/0081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050237 A2 20001108; EP 1050237 A3 20010516; AU 3132900 A 20001123; CA 2307701 A1 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011117

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 46B 17/08 A, 7B 60S 3/04 B, 7A 46B 15/00 B, 7A 46B 5/00 B

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOZEAU, KEVIN

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHAN, EDWIN

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUGHES, WILLIAM SCOTT

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOWELL, DAVID

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRENCH, DAVID L.

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI