Global patent index - EP 1050248 A3

EP 1050248 A3 2000-12-13 - Power actuated reclining chair with wall-hugger function

Title (en)

Power actuated reclining chair with wall-hugger function

Title (de)

Kraftbetätigter Lehnstuhl zur Gebrauch in der Nähe einer Wand

Title (fr)

Chaise motorisée inclinable utilisable à proximité d'une paroi

Publication

EP 1050248 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00303861 A

Priority

US 30597299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1050248A2] A reclining chair has a backrest and a seat, which includes a front seat portion and a rear seat portion. The chair is carried on a mechanized base. The base carries an actuator, which is coupled to a reclining linkage assembly. The reclining linkage assembly applies force in response to operation of the actuator to advance the seat and backrest forward while also tilting the backrest rearward from a generally upright position to a generally reclined position. Advancing the seat and backrest forward while the backrest reclines, keeps the distance between the backrest and an adjacent wall generally constant, regardless of whether the backrest is in the generally upright position and in the generally reclined position. The actuator can also operate a lifting linkage assembly for lifting the seat and tilting the seat forward to assist exit from the chair. A locking mechanism resists extension of an associated footrest linkage when the seat is lifted and tilted forward. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/032; A61G 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/032 (2006.01); A47C 1/034 (2006.01); A61G 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/0345 (2013.01); A61G 5/14 (2013.01); A61G 5/1075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050248 A2 20001108; EP 1050248 A3 20001213; US 2002063459 A1 20020530

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030217

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010525

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI