Global Patent Index - EP 1050262 A2

EP 1050262 A2 2000-11-08 - Vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Saugreinigungsgerät

Title (fr)

Aspirateur

Publication

EP 1050262 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107335 A

Priority

DE 19915881 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19915881A1] The vacuum cleaner has a suction fan (3) and two suction openings (15,17) on its housing (2) to which suction tools can be connected and a changeover element (18) for changing the suction air flow between the openings as required. The changeover element is a three-way valve set by a twisting movement.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Saugreinigungsgerät, mit einem einen Saugluftstrom erzeugenden Sauggebläse (3) und zwei am Gehäuse (2) des Saugreinigungsgerätes vorgesehenen Saugöffnungen (15;17) , an die Saugwerkzeuge anschließbar sind, bei welchem Gerät der Saugluftstrom mittels eines Umschaltgliedes (18) wahlweise auf eine der beiden Saugöffnungen (15 bzw. 17) umschaltbar ist. Ein wahlweises Umschalten zwischen den beiden Saugöffnungen ist auf einfache Weise dadurch möglich, daß als Umschaltglied ein durch eine Verdrehbewegung verstellbares Dreiwegeventil (18) vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 5/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19915881 A1 20001012; DE 50014683 D1 20071115; EP 1050262 A2 20001108; EP 1050262 A3 20020814; EP 1050262 B1 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50014683

- Effective date: 20150402

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071003

2008-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-04-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080103

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014683 P 20071115

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2007-10-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050513

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030214

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI