Global Patent Index - EP 1050324 A3

EP 1050324 A3 2000-12-06 - Alpine ski

Title (en)

Alpine ski

Title (de)

Abfahrtski

Title (fr)

Ski alpin

Publication

EP 1050324 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 00420082 A

Priority

FR 9905956 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1050324A2] Ski (1) comprises tip zone, skate zone and heel zone. Ski also comprises series of grooves (21-26) parallel to longitudinal of ski. External grooves (21, 23, 24, 26) are used to reinforce longitudinal ends of ski (7, 8). Middle grooves (22, 25) are lon than external grooves so as to ensure good longitudinal guiding of ski.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/0422 (2013.01); A63C 5/0405 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050324 A2 20001108; EP 1050324 A3 20001206; EP 1050324 B1 20041013; AT 279240 T 20041015; DE 60014752 D1 20041118; DE 60014752 T2 20051124; FR 2793154 A1 20001110; FR 2793154 B1 20010601

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60014752

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100412

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060426

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-03-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050317

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60014752 P 20041118

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010420

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI