Global Patent Index - EP 1050340 A1

EP 1050340 A1 2000-11-08 - Shredding device for material to be shredded by knife action, having a rotor mounted in a housing

Title (en)

Shredding device for material to be shredded by knife action, having a rotor mounted in a housing

Title (de)

Zerkleinerungsvorrichtung für durch Messereinwirkung zu zerkleinerndem Material mit einem in einem Gehäuse angeordneten Rotor

Title (fr)

Dispositif de broyage pour matière à broyer sous l'action de couteaux, comportant un rotor monté dans un carter

Publication

EP 1050340 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108538 A

Priority

  • DE 29907584 U
  • DE 29915606 U

Abstract (en)

Higher shredding efficiency is effected by a sickle-shaped pressure applicator(6) moving against an arc shaped pressure wall and pressing the material to be shredded towards the rotor and counter knives(2). Preferred Features: The pressure wall(5) has an outward swivelling flap in the lower area forming a housing wall(5a) which enables removal of non-shreddable material. The flap has similar curvature to the pressure wall and is mechanically-hydraulicall operated.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Zerkleinerungsvorrichtung für durch Messereinwirkung zu zerkleinerndes Material,insbesondere für Holz-, Kunststoff-, Reifen- und Textilmaterial nach dem Prinzip der Rotorzerkleinerung, wobei erfindungsgemäss an einer bogenförmigen Nachdrückwand (5) ein sichelförmiger Nachdrücker (6) für das zu zerkleinernde Material angeordnet ist, der dieses Material zum Rotor (1) bzw. zum Gegenmesser (2) schiebt bzw. drückt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/22; B02C 18/14; B02C 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/14 (2006.01); B02C 18/22 (2006.01); B02C 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 23/04 (2013.01); B02C 18/145 (2013.01); B02C 18/2216 (2013.01); B02C 18/2233 (2013.01); B02C 18/2275 (2013.01); B02C 2018/188 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050340 A1 20001108; EP 1050340 B1 20031119; AT 254506 T 20031215; DK 1050340 T3 20040329; ES 2209713 T3 20040701; PT 1050340 E 20040430

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110420

2012-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110419

2012-02-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111101

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-09 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111101

2011-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINDNER-RECYCLINGTECH G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110430

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100419

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100419

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100512

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100417

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100419

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LINDNER-RECYCLINGTECH GMBH

- Free text: LINDNER-RECYCLINGTECH GMBH#VILLACHER STRASSE 48#9800 SPITTAL/DRAU (AT) -TRANSFER TO- LINDNER-RECYCLINGTECH GMBH#VILLACHER STRASSE 48#9800 SPITTAL/DRAU (AT)

2006-04-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050918

2006-02-08 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20050918

2005-10-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-04-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-04-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050419

2004-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ANTON UNTERWURZACHER MASCHINENBAU G.M.B.H

2004-10-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ANTON UNTERWURZACHER MASCHINENBAU G.M.B.H

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209713 T3

2004-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-03-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-03-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-03-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-02-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040226

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-02-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-02-11 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20040211

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004473 P 20031224

2003-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-19 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDNER-RECYCLINGTECH GMBH

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI