Global Patent Index - EP 1050349 A2

EP 1050349 A2 2000-11-08 - Mandrel clamping arrangement

Title (en)

Mandrel clamping arrangement

Title (de)

Spanndornanordnung

Title (fr)

Mandrin de serrage

Publication

EP 1050349 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00109268 A

Priority

  • GB 9910424 A
  • GB 9912260 A

Abstract (en)

A mandrel clamping arrangement is described comprising an actuation mechanism (4) coupled to a clamping assembly (9). The actuation mechanism (4) comprises a linearly actuable connection rod (8) coupled to a pivotally mounted cam actuator (12) which is angularly displaced by virtue of the linear motion of said connection rod (8). The actuation mechanism is coupled to the clamping assembly by means of interengaging teeth and toothed sprockets (22,24) or by means of a pin (54) disposed at the free end of the actuator which is received in a slot (58) in an eccentric component. In either case, the rotation of the actuator (12) in one direction causes rotation of a cam (28) in the alternate direction, said cam (28) having an arcuate surface through which a clamping force can be exerted on a mandrel (18) beneath said cam (28). Optionally, a clamping bar (30) biased against the cam (28) may also be provided so that the clamping force on the mandrel (18) is exerted by said bar (30). The cam arrangement (28) ensures uniform and precisely applied clamping force over the entire mandrel (18) length and does not require any particularly precisely machined components to achieve this end. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/26 (2006.01); B21D 51/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/26 (2013.01); B21D 51/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050349 A2 20001108; EP 1050349 A3 20020724

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021031

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21D 11/00 A, 7B 23Q 3/06 B, 7B 21D 51/52 B

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI