Global Patent Index - EP 1050350 A1

EP 1050350 A1 2000-11-08 - Universal puncher holder adaptor for punching machines

Title (en)

Universal puncher holder adaptor for punching machines

Title (de)

Universaler Adapter für Stanzwerkzeughalter für eine Stanzmaschine

Title (fr)

Adaptateur universel pour porte-poinçon pour machine à poinçonner

Publication

EP 1050350 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00109068 A

Priority

GB 9910304 A

Abstract (en)

A universal punch holder adaptor (1) for punching machines, comprising a cylindrical seat (3), which is mounted below the lower face of a hammer (4) and inside which a solid punch holder body (5) is accommodated, said body being rigidly coupled to the hammer and being provided with at least one blind and centered seat (6) for the insertion of punches (2), externally actuatable means (7) for the quick retention/release of the punches (2) in said seat (6) and means (10) for extracting the punch from the sheet metal being also provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 28/34; B21D 45/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/34 (2006.01); B21D 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/34 (2013.01); B21D 45/00 (2013.01); B21D 45/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050350 A1 20001108; GB 2349596 A 20001108; GB 9910304 D0 19990630; TR 200001254 A2 20001221; TR 200001254 A3 20001221

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050621

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031118

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010126

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI