Global Patent Index - EP 1050354 A1

EP 1050354 A1 2000-11-08 - Formable exothermic composition and feeder made therefrom

Title (en)

Formable exothermic composition and feeder made therefrom

Title (de)

Formbare exotherme Zusammensetzung und Speiser daraus

Title (fr)

Compositions moulables exothermiques et masselotte d'alimentation obtenue à partir de cette composition

Publication

EP 1050354 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108925 A

Priority

DE 19920570 A

Abstract (en)

A moldable exothermic composition, contains one or more alkali and/or alkaline earth metal carbonates, hydrogen carbonates and/or oxalates. A moldable exothermic composition, for foundry feeder production, comprises an easily oxidizable metal, an oxidizing agent, filler particles and a binder with addition of one or more carbonates, hydrogen carbonates and/or oxalates of group Ia or IIa elements. An Independent claim is also included for a foundry feeder produced from the above composition.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine formbare exotherme Zusammensetzung zur Herstellung von Speisern für die Gießereiindustrie. Neben den für derartige Zusammensetzungen üblichen Bestandteilen, nämlich einem leicht oxidierbaren Metall, einem Oxidationsmittel für das leicht oxidierbare Metall, einem partikulären Füllstoff und einem Bindemittel umfaßt die Zusammensetzung noch einen Anteil an einem oder mehreren Carbonaten der ersten oder zweiten Hauptgruppe und/oder einem oder mehreren Hydrogencarbonaten der ersten oder zweiten Hauptgruppe und/oder einem oder mehreren Oxalaten der ersten oder zweiten Hauptgruppe. Die beschriebenen exothermen Zusammensetzungen umfassen typischerweise keine fluorhaltigen Verbindungen. Ihr Zünd- und Brennverhalten ist dennoch akzeptabel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 7/10; B22C 1/00; C04B 35/65

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 1/00 (2006.01); B22C 1/02 (2006.01); B22D 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 1/00 (2013.01); B22C 1/02 (2013.01); B22D 7/104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0426848 A1 19910515 - KAZAK MEZHOTRASLEVOI NTTS SVS [SU], et al
  • [X] WO 8002811 A1 19801224 - FOSECO INT [GB], et al
  • [A] US 4767800 A 19880830 - NEU MAX G [GB], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 01 31 January 1996 (1996-01-31)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198137, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class L02, AN 1981-66741D, XP002145039

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050354 A1 20001108; DE 19920570 A1 20001116; DE 19920570 B4 20080110

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-07-11 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17P

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI