Global Patent Index - EP 1050356 A1

EP 1050356 A1 2000-11-08 - Method and apparatus for filling casting moulds with liquid metals

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for filling casting moulds with liquid metals

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Füllen von Giessformen mit flüssigen Metallen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour remplir des moules avec des métaux liquides

Publication

EP 1050356 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103559 A

Priority

DE 19920267 A

Abstract (en)

To fill sand molds in mold boxes (2), the insertion channel (14) is on a horizontal plane during pouring. Its opening is def by a limit surface, which is tightly against the filling channel while the molten metal (27) is passed into the mold under a low pressure. The assembly has a casting machine (22) with a pressure vessel (23) and a filling channel (28) for connection to the horizontal insertion channel (14). The coupling between the filling channel (28) and the insertion channel is held at a given pressure.

Abstract (de)

Ein Gießverfahren für den Abguss, insbesondere von mit Formkasten (2) versehenen Sandformen, welches es gestattet, den apparativen Aufwand niedrig zu halten, das Kreislaufmaterial einzusparen und eine verbesserte Qualität zu erreichen besteht darin, dass der Eingießkanal (14) in einer beim Abguss im Wesentlichen horizontal liegenden Ebene verläuft und mit einer dessen Mündung (31) begrenzenden Anlagefläche versehen ist, an die dicht eine Füllleitung anlegbar ist, über welche die Gießform mit unter niedrigem Druck stehenden Metall (27) füllbar ist. Eine Gießanlage zur Durchführung des Verfahrens besteht aus einer Vergießmaschine (22) mit einem Druckkessel (23) und einer Füllleitung (28), welche an den im Wesentlichen in einer horizontalen Ebene liegenden Eingießkanal anschließbar ist, wobei die Kopplung von Füllleitung (28) und Eingießkanal über einen vorgegebenen Anlagedruck erhalten wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 18/04; B22C 9/08; B22D 33/00; B22D 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/08 (2006.01); B22D 18/04 (2006.01); B22D 33/00 (2006.01); B22D 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 33/00 (2013.01); B22C 9/08 (2013.01); B22D 18/04 (2013.01); B22D 47/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050356 A1 20001108; DE 19920267 A1 20001109; JP 2000326063 A 20001128; PL 339885 A1 20001106; TR 200001240 A2 20010122; TR 200001240 A3 20010122; US 2002036072 A1 20020328; US 6453978 B1 20020924; US 6460605 B1 20021008

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030820

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001113

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI