Global Patent Index - EP 1050379 A1

EP 1050379 A1 2000-11-08 - Spanner

Title (en)

Spanner

Title (de)

Schraubenschlüssel

Title (fr)

Clé

Publication

EP 1050379 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99107040 A

Priority

EP 99107040 A

Abstract (en)

A spanner includes a shank with a head (20,220) having a first jaw (21) and a second jaw (24) with a throat portion (220) connected therebetween which has a concavity (22) defined therein. The first jaw (21) has a first recess (26) defined in the inside thereof with a first engaging surface (242) connected between the first recess and the throat portion. The second jaw (24) has a second recess (27) defined in the inside thereof and a second engaging surface (243) extending from one of two ends of the concavity toward the second recess, and a third engaging surface (241) connected between the second engaging surface and the second recess. An angle is defined between the first engaging surface and the inside of the first jaw. Each of the second engaging surface and the third engaging surface has a respective angle defined between the inside of the second jaw. An object can be clamped between the first engaging surface and the third engaging surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/08 (2006.01); B25B 13/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/46 (2013.01); B25B 13/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050379 A1 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030214

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI