Global Patent Index - EP 1050382 A2

EP 1050382 A2 2000-11-08 - Tool joint

Title (en)

Tool joint

Title (de)

Gelenk für ein Werkzeug

Title (fr)

Articulation pour outil

Publication

EP 1050382 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108419 A

Priority

DE 19920544 A

Abstract (en)

The link for an implement has a holder (1) into which a swivel element (10) is inserted and which rotates on the drive/drive axis of the implement. The swivel element is swiveled out of the drive/driven axis. At least one recoil element acts between the container and swivel element. The holder and swivel element each have a hollow interior (2) with matching polygonal cross-sectio over part of their length.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung schlägt ein Schwenkgelenk für ein Werkzeug vor, mit dem ein Drehmoment übertragen werden soll. Das Schwenkgelenk enthält zwei drehtest miteinander verbundene Teile, die aus einer gemeinsamen Achse heraus verschwenkt werden können. Es sind Rückstellelemente vorgesehen, die die beiden Teile in eine gemeinsame Achse zurückstellen. Die Zurückstellung erfolgt unter Wirkung einer Feder. Das Schwenkgelenk soll die Durchführung von Schreibvorgängen an schwer zugänglichen Stellen erleichtern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/16 (2006.01); B25B 23/00 (2006.01); F16D 1/10 (2006.01); F16D 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/0028 (2013.01); B25B 23/0014 (2013.01); B25B 23/0035 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050382 A2 20001108; EP 1050382 A3 20011017; DE 19920544 A1 20001116; DE 19920544 C2 20010607; JP 2000354978 A 20001226; TW 436387 B 20010528

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060801

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040203

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020223

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI