Global Patent Index - EP 1050388 A2

EP 1050388 A2 2000-11-08 - Machine for machining edges with a workpiece conveyor chain

Title (en)

Machine for machining edges with a workpiece conveyor chain

Title (de)

Kantenbearbeitungsmaschine mit Werkstücktransportkette

Title (fr)

Machine pour l'usinage des arêtes avec chaine transporteuse de pièces

Publication

EP 1050388 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106890 A

Priority

DE 19921058 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19921058C1] The machine may work on flat workpieces (5) and has a transport device consisting of a chain (1) passing over end rollers (2) and driven by a motor (13) working on a screw arrangement (15). A cam (17) engages the chain and moves it along. The workpieces move into the gap (6) between the upper surface of the conveyer chain and the underside of the bottom run (9) of the band.

Abstract (de)

Auf der Kette (1) einer Kantenbearbeitungsmaschine werden die Werkstücke (5) auf dem Obertrum aufgenommen und entlang von Bearbeitungsstationen im Durchlauf befördert. Über der Transportkette läuft ein Oberdruck um, der ein nach oben hin abgestütztes Untertrum hat, welches oberhalb des Obertrums der Transportkette sich in deren Förderrichtung erstreckt sowie mit dieser sich synchron bewegt. Zwischen den Obertrumen der Transportkette und dem Oberdruck werden die Werkstücke unter Druckbeaufschlagung verspannt. Um die Transportkette einfacher zu gestalten und hinsichtlich der Anordnung sowie dem Abstand der zu bearbeitenden Werkstücke eine höhere Flexibilität zu erzielen, ist an der Einlaufseite der Transportkette eine die Werkstücke erfassende, zwischen den Oberdruck und die Transportkette an einer Einzugstelle einführende Mitnehmervorrichtung angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27C 5/06; B23Q 7/06; B23Q 7/18; B27B 31/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 5/04 (2006.01); B27B 25/04 (2006.01); B27B 31/06 (2006.01); B27C 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27C 5/06 (2013.01); B27B 5/04 (2013.01); B27B 25/04 (2013.01); B27B 31/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19921058 C1 20000615; DE 50013107 D1 20060817; EP 1050388 A2 20001108; EP 1050388 A3 20040526; EP 1050388 B1 20060705; ES 2264656 T3 20070116

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170328

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110415

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090304

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070410

2007-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2264656 T3

2006-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013107 P 20060817

2006-08-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: IMA KLESSMANN GMBH HOLZBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEME

2006-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2006-07-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060705

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-02-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2005-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 27C 5/06 A

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 23Q 7/18 B

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 27B 31/06 B

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 23Q 7/06 B

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI