Global Patent Index - EP 1050390 A2

EP 1050390 A2 2000-11-08 - Blade ring-type chip shredder for cutting coarse chips

Title (en)

Blade ring-type chip shredder for cutting coarse chips

Title (de)

Messerring-Zerspaner zum Zerspanen von Hackschnitzeln

Title (fr)

Déchiqueteuse à lames-couronne pour couper des coupeaux

Publication

EP 1050390 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108300 A

Priority

DE 19921597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19921597C1] For chopped material, the shredder has a blade ring comprising a crown of blade packets enclosed between support rings. A rotor supports a number of blades (2.1). Each blade packet contains a blade support (1.2), a clamp plate (1.3) and a blade (1.1) tensioned between the blade support and the clamp plate. The cutting edge of the blade faces inwards. At least two fixture screws (4) are fitted through a hole (1.3.1) in the clamp plate and through an opening in the blade (1.1), being screwed into a tapped hole (1.2.2) in the blade support. At least one of the fixture screws is formed along a part of its length as a fitment pin (4.3). The blade packet has a wear plate (1.6).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Messerring-Zerspaner zum Zerspanen von Hackschnitzeln; mit einem Messerring (1), umfassend einen Kranz von Messerpaketen sowie zwei diese tragende Tragringe (5.1,5.2), die die Messerpakete zwischen sich einschließen; mit einem Rotor (2), der eine Vielzahl von Rotorschaufeln (2.1) trägt; jedes Messerpaket enthält die folgenden Teile: einen Messerträger (1.2), eine Klemmplatte (1.3), ein zwischen Messerträger und Klemmplatte eingespanntes Messer, dessen Schneide nach innen weist; wenigstens zwei Befestigungsschrauben (4), die jeweils durch eine Bohrung (1.3.1) in der Klemmplatte (1.3) und durch eine Öffnung im Messer hindurchgeführt und in eine Gewindebohrung (1.2.2) im Messerträger (1.2) eingeschraubt sind; wenigstens eine der Befestigungsschrauben (4) ist auf einem Teil ihrer Länge als Paßstift (4.3) ausgebildet; die zugehörenden Bohrungen von Klemmplatte (1.3) und Messerträger (1.2) sind wenigstens auf einem Teil ihrer Länge als Paßbohrungen ausgebildet und dort auf den Durchmesser des Paßstiftes (4.3) abgestimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27L 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/18 (2006.01); B02C 18/14 (2006.01); B27L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19921597 C1 20000727; AT 336346 T 20060915; BR 0002084 A 20010102; DE 50013318 D1 20060928; DK 1050390 T3 20061227; EP 1050390 A2 20001108; EP 1050390 A3 20040428; EP 1050390 B1 20060816; ES 2269036 T3 20070401; JP 2000350940 A 20001219; US 6561885 B1 20030513

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161104

2017-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20060403801

- Effective date: 20161104

2016-11-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150414

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150414

2015-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150428

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140415

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150423

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150526

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130415

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 336346 T

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-12-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120510

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070414

2009-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070518

2007-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2269036 T3

2007-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-01-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070116

2006-12-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-11-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-11-23 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060403801

2006-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060924

2006-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013318 P 20060928

2006-09-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-08-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-08-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-08-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-08-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2005-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI