Global Patent Index - EP 1050398 A2

EP 1050398 A2 2000-11-08 - Rotary tabletting press

Title (en)

Rotary tabletting press

Title (de)

Rundläufer-Tablettenpresse

Title (fr)

Presse pour comprimés à table rotative

Publication

EP 1050398 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104902 A

Priority

DE 19920380 A

Abstract (en)

The rotary tablet press comprises a quick-action locking mechanism between the ends of the rotatable die disk (10) and its d shaft (26). The elements (38, 56) of this mechanism are located in the hollow spaces of the die disk and its drive shaft, and ar operable by means of a rod (54) which is movably installed in bore (36) of the drive shaft and is controlled by an actuating sys

Abstract (de)

Rundläufer-Tablettenpresse, mit einer in einem Gehäuse drehbar gelagerten Matrizenscheibe, die Führungen für Ober- und Unterstempel aufweist, deren Stellung von gehäusefesten Kurvenscheiben gesteuert wird, und einer unterhalb der Matrizenscheibe (10) angeordneten aufrechten Antriebswelle, die lösbar mit der Matrizenscheibe koppelbar ist, wobei die Matrizenscheibe (10) so ausgebildet ist, daß sie nach Lösen von der Antriebswelle (26) und geringfügigem Anheben seitlich herausbewegbar ist, wobei an den einander zugekehrten Enden von Matrizenscheibe (10) und Antriebswelle (26) ein Schnellverschluß vorgesehen ist, dessen Teile (38,56) in Hohlräumen von Matrizenscheibe (10) und Antriebswelle (26) angeordnet sind und der von einer Betätigungsstange (54) betätigbar ist, die in einem axialen Kanal (36) der Antriebswelle (26) beweglich gelagert ist und von einer Betätigungsvorrichtung (74,82,84) betätigbar ist zum wahlweisen Verspannen oder Lösen von Matrizenscheibe (10) und Antriebswelle (26). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/08 (2006.01); B30B 15/00 (2006.01); B30B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/08 (2013.01); B30B 15/0023 (2013.01); B30B 15/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050398 A2 20001108; EP 1050398 A3 20010117; EP 1050398 B1 20050511; DE 19920380 A1 20001116; DE 19920380 C2 20010712; US 6361305 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150308

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150308

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150308

2015-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50010260

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140508

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FETTE COMPACTING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FETTE GMBH, 21493 SCHWARZENBEK, DE

- Document: DE 50010260

- Effective date: 20110621

2011-08-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50010260

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20110621

2011-08-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50010260

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENTANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20110621

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010260 P 20050616

2005-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FETTE GMBH

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 30B 11/08 A, 7B 23B 31/26 B

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000318

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI