Global Patent Index - EP 1050400 A2

EP 1050400 A2 2000-11-08 - Control and monitoring device for rotary tabletting press

Title (en)

Control and monitoring device for rotary tabletting press

Title (de)

Steuer- und Überwachungsvorrichtung für eine Rundläufer-Tablettenpresse

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande et de surveillance pour presse à comprimés à table rotative

Publication

EP 1050400 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107283 A

Priority

DE 19920377 A

Abstract (en)

The device has an associated electrical cabinet (16), a control panel (22) and peripherals (24,26) for dust removal, filling testing the tablets etc. The cabinet contains a process computer connected to the actuators and sensors of the press and peripherals. The actuators and/or sensors have bus-compatible modules (12,28) connected to the cabinet or process computer via two-wire cable (14). The process computer receives or transmits the signals from or to the actuators in a digital serial manner.

Abstract (de)

Steuer- und Überwachungsvorrichtung für eine Rundläufer-Tablettenpresse, der ein Schaltschrank, ein Bedienpult sowie Peripheriegeräte zum Entstauben, Abfüllen, Prüfen der Tablette usw. zugeordnet sind, wobei im Schaltschrank ein Prozeßrechner angeordnet ist, der mit den Aktoren und Sensoren der Tablettenpresse und der Peripheriegeräte verbunden ist, wobei die Aktoren und/oder Sensoren busfähige Module (12,28,34,36,38) aufweisen, die über eine Zweidrahtleitung (14,32) mit dem Schaltschrank bzw. Prozeßrechner verbunden sind und der Prozeßrechner die von den Sensoren kommenden bzw. zu den Aktoren hinführenden Signale digitalisiert seriell empfängt bzw. sendet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 11/08; B30B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/00 (2006.01); B30B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/0082 (2013.01); B30B 11/005 (2013.01); B30B 11/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050400 A2 20001108; EP 1050400 A3 20021218; DE 19920377 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FETTE GMBH

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI