Global patent index - EP 1050452 A2

EP 1050452 A2 2000-11-08 - Davit

Title (en)

Davit

Title (de)

Davit

Title (fr)

Bossoir

Publication

EP 1050452 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00109036 A

Priority

IT TV990053 A

Abstract (en)

A davit, particularly for lifeboats for passenger ships, comprising two lifting arms (3a,3b) shaped like an inverted L which are adapted to support a lifeboat (2) at bow (4) and stern (5) regions thereof and are hinged to a supporting structure (1) of the ship on an axis (8) which is parallel to a longitudinal plane of symmetry of the ship. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 23/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 23/18 (2006.01); B63B 23/10 (2006.01); B63B 23/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 23/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050452 A2 20001108; EP 1050452 A3 20020306; IT 1311833 B1 20020319; IT TV990053 A1 20001107; JP 2000318679 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1033567

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-01-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20041122

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040604

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20020801;LV PAYMENT 20020801;RO PAYMENT 20020801;SI PAYMENT 20020801

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI