Global Patent Index - EP 1050453 A2

EP 1050453 A2 2000-11-08 - Life raft

Title (en)

Life raft

Title (de)

Rettungsfloss

Title (fr)

Radeau de sauvetage

Publication

EP 1050453 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105511 A

Priority

DE 29907943 U

Abstract (en)

The inflatable life raft has entry steps projecting down from the buoyant body between two pneumatic cantilevers, secured by guy. The lower end of the steps are connected by the guy to the free end of the cantilevers (4,5) by a guy (17) so that the cantilevers extend downwards at an angle to an imaginary vertical passing through the adjacent sector of the buoyant body (1,2).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein aufblasbares Rettungsfloß mit einer dessen Tragschläuche (1,2) nach unten hin überragenden Einstiegtreppe (7), die zwischen zwei Auslegern (4,5) angeordnet und durch Abspannungen gesichert ist. Um zu verhindern, dass die Einstiegtreppe (7) beim Gebrauch nach hinten, also in Richtung auf das Zentrum des Flosses ausweichen kann, ist aufgrund der Erfindung eine Abspannung (17) vorgesehen, die das untere Ende der Einstiegtreppe mit dem Ende von pneumatischen Auslegern (4,5) in der Weise verbindet, dass sich die Abspannung (17) schräg nach hinten unten in Richtung auf eine gedachte Senkrechte erstreckt, die durch den benachbarten Abschnitt eines Tragschlauches bestimmt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 27/14 (2006.01); B63C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/04 (2013.01); B63B 27/14 (2013.01); B63B 2027/145 (2013.01); B63C 2009/042 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907943 U1 19990909; EP 1050453 A2 20001108; EP 1050453 A3 20020807

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081001

2006-11-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR IT

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2003-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI