Global patent index - EP 1050459 A2

EP 1050459 A2 2000-11-08 - Method and device for wrapping an object with a thermoplastic film

Title (en)

Method and device for wrapping an object with a thermoplastic film

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einschlagen eines Gutes mit einer Kunststofffolie

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour envelopper un objet avec une feuille thermoplastique

Publication

EP 1050459 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108426 A

Priority

DE 19921032 A

Abstract (en)

A closer (5), movably mounted on a rail (50), has its position monitored by a positioner (6) unit. Depending on the position the closer, a control controls a clamp (40) in order to prevent the plastic sheeting (20) from tearing and or the contents (1) f shifting position. The contents are enclosed on one or more sides by a sheet and stay between two lengths (21,22) of sheeting. T closer positions the two sheets so that they are welded by a sealing unit (8); the two cut ends of the middle sheeting part are welded.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einschlagen eines Gutes mit einer Kunststofffolie vorgeschlagen. Die Kunststofffolie legt sich hierbei möglichst vielseitig um das Gut. Während der Schließbewegung des Schließers, welche mit der Siegeleinheit zusammenwirkt, wird gleichzeitig ein Spannmittel eingesetzt, um die Folie im Bereich des Gutes straffzuziehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050459 A2 20001108; EP 1050459 A3 20030604; DE 19921032 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI