Global Patent Index - EP 1050459 A3

EP 1050459 A3 2003-06-04 - Method and device for wrapping an object with a thermoplastic film

Title (en)

Method and device for wrapping an object with a thermoplastic film

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einschlagen eines Gutes mit einer Kunststofffolie

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour envelopper un objet avec une feuille thermoplastique

Publication

EP 1050459 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00108426 A

Priority

DE 19921032 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1050459A2] A closer (5), movably mounted on a rail (50), has its position monitored by a positioner (6) unit. Depending on the position the closer, a control controls a clamp (40) in order to prevent the plastic sheeting (20) from tearing and or the contents (1) f shifting position. The contents are enclosed on one or more sides by a sheet and stay between two lengths (21,22) of sheeting. T closer positions the two sheets so that they are welded by a sealing unit (8); the two cut ends of the middle sheeting part are welded.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050459 A2 20001108; EP 1050459 A3 20030604; DE 19921032 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI