Global patent index - EP 1050466 A1

EP 1050466 A1 2000-11-08 - Method and apparatus for packaging articles in a shrink foil

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for packaging articles in a shrink foil

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verpackung von Gegenständen in Schrumpffolie

Title (fr)

Procede et appareil pour emballer des articles dans un film retractable

Publication

EP 1050466 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109387 A

Priority

DE 19920057 A

Abstract (en)

The packaging machine using a shrink tunnel (15) involves the objects (18) in the tunnel being exposed to hot air for shrink and for joining the sheets together. The sheeting (23,24) is subjected to a fast current of air in addition to the hot air treat by a compressed air applicator (40). The applicator extends especially in the lower and preferably also the side part of the tra along which the objects travel. At least one compressed air pipe (41) has outlets (34,38) especially and the direction and cross-section of which can be altered by adjustments.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Verpackung von Gegenständen (18) in Schrumpffolie (23, 24), bei dem die Schrumpffolie den Gegenstand im wesentlichen umgibt und in einem Schrumpftunnel (15) durch bewegte Heißluft geschlossen und/oder eingeschrumpft wird, kann erfindungsgemäß eine zusätzliche Beaufschlagung (B, C, E) von Folienbereichen (46, 48) mit schnell strömender Luft eingesetzt werden. Durch diese berührungslose Beaufschlagung kann die Schrumpffolie (23, 24) in eine für Schrumpfung oder Verschluß günstigere Form gebracht werden. Des weiteren wird eine Verpackungsvorrichtung (11) mit einem Schrumpftunnel (15) für Gegenstände (18) vorgeschlagen, die eine Austragvorrichtung (40) zur Beaufschlagung der Folie mit schnell strömender Luft zusätzlich zu der Heißluftbehandlung aufweist. Es können verstellbare Austrittsöffnungen (34) vorgesehen sein, insbesondere innerhalb des Schrumpftunnels. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 53/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 53/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 53/063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050466 A1 20001108; DE 19920057 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020610

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010427

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI