Global Patent Index - EP 1050470 A1

EP 1050470 A1 2000-11-08 - Detection of ophthalmic mouldings in a package

Title (en)

Detection of ophthalmic mouldings in a package

Title (de)

Erfassung von Ophtalmischen Formkörpern in einer Verpackung

Title (fr)

DETECTION DE MOULAGES OPHTALMIQUES DANS UN EMBALLAGE

Publication

EP 1050470 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00109353 A

Priority

  • EP 00109353 A
  • EP 99108810 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a method and a device for detecting the presence of an ophthalmic moulding consisting of a biocompatible polymeric material, especially an ophthalmic lens, particularly a contact lens, in a package. The invention solves the problem through the use of a spectroscopic process. Packages containing a moulding, especially a contact lens, have a characteristic change in their measuring spectrum compared with a package without a contact lens. By evaluating the spectra, it is possible to determine whether or not there is a contact lens in a package. In particular, by using the measuring method according to the invention, one can determine directly after the filling procedure whether there is a contact lens in the package. In addition, the invention is suitable for checking whether contact lenses are contained in the already sealed package. During this procedure, the package remains intact. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 57/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/00 (2006.01); B65B 57/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/008 (2013.01); B65B 57/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050470 A1 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031202

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS-ERFINDUNGEN VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI