Global Patent Index - EP 1050477 A1

EP 1050477 A1 2000-11-08 - Screwcap

Title (en)

Screwcap

Title (de)

Schraubverschluss

Title (fr)

Bouchon à vis

Publication

EP 1050477 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108917 A

Priority

DE 29907691 U

Abstract (en)

The screw cap (1) is made of plastic and has an internal thread (2). The outer surface (6) of the side wall (7) is built ont the internal thread after the initial manufacture. The wall thickness of the cap is constant over the entire height of the thread. T surface may be rippled or ribbed at the transition from the cap side wall to the cap top (8).

Abstract (de)

Ein becherförmiger Schraubverschluss (1), der aus Kunststoff besteht, ist mit einem Innengewinde (2) versehen. Die äußere Mantelfläche (6) seiner Seitenwand (7) ist dem Innengewinde (2) seiner inneren Umfangsfläche derart nachgebildet, dass die Wandstärke des Schraubverschlusses (1) über die gesamte Höhe des Gewindes konstant ist (Fig. 2). Es wird in erheblichem Maße Material eingespart, was sich produktionssteigernd und energiesparend und allgemein kostensenkend auswirkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/04 (2006.01); B65D 41/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/04 (2013.01); B65D 41/3447 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907691 U1 19990805; EP 1050477 A1 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071019

2007-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040813

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENZI-BREUER, BIANCA

2004-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SPAAR-BREUER, JEANNETTE

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HENZI-BREUER, BIANCA

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SPAAR-BREUER, JEANNETTE

2004-04-14 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040220

2003-09-03 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20030409

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI