Global Patent Index - EP 1050479 A3

EP 1050479 A3 2001-05-02 - Container with safety closure

Title (en)

Container with safety closure

Title (de)

Behälter mit Sicherheitsverschluss

Title (fr)

Récipient à couvercle de sécurité

Publication

EP 1050479 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00108768 A

Priority

IT VI990033 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1050479A2] A container with safety closure which includes a tray (8) and a lid (10) with mutually associable rims, so as to provide a first closure which is suitable to withstand the ordinary stresses to which the container is subjected and form a hermetic seal to prevent spillage of the contents; its particularity consists of the fact that it includes a first engagement means (14), which is located proximate to the rim of the tray and protrudes externally from the body of the tray, and a second engagement means (15) which runs continuously along the rim of the lid, to be engaged in the first engagement means by pressing. The invention fully solves the problems observed in the prior art, since it prevents the accidental separation of the lid from the tray and at the same time does not make the container more difficult to open or re-close than conventional ones. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 43/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/0206 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0015 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00092 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00194 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00472 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00509 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00546 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00629 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00685 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0074 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00796 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050479 A2 20001108; EP 1050479 A3 20010502; IT 248765 Y1 20030212; IT VI990033 U1 20001030; IT VI990033 V0 19990430

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030812

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI