Global Patent Index - EP 1050483 A1

EP 1050483 A1 2000-11-08 - Foil with security feature, production method and its use as packaging material

Title (en)

Foil with security feature, production method and its use as packaging material

Title (de)

Folie mit Sicherheitsmerkmal, ein Verfahren zu deren Herstellung sowie deren Verwendung als Verpackungsmaterial

Title (fr)

Feuille avec fonction de sécurité, méthode de fabrication et son utilisation comme matériau d'emballage

Publication

EP 1050483 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109025 A

Priority

DE 19920356 A

Abstract (en)

The plastic foil, possibly incorporating a cover layer, is characterized by the fact that it is printed on one side with a security dye. An Independent claim is also included for a method which includes a step of printing with a security dye, for producing suc foil, and its application as packaging material.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine gegebenenfalls kaschierte Folie aus Kunststoff, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Folie auf einer Seite mit einer Sicherheitsfarbe bedruckt ist. Ebenfalls beschrieben wird ein Verfahren zur Herstellung einer solchen Folie sowie deren Verwendung als Verpackungsmaterial.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 65/38; B41M 3/14; G09F 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B44F 1/12 (2006.01); G09F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/0291 (2013.01); B41M 3/144 (2013.01); G09F 3/0292 (2013.01); G09F 3/0294 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050483 A1 20001108; CN 1277136 A 20001220; DE 19920356 A1 20001109; US 6364363 B1 20020402

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011221

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WIPAK WALSRODE GMBH & CO. KG

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI