Global Patent Index - EP 1050485 A1

EP 1050485 A1 2000-11-08 - Tear strip with security feature, production method and its use in packaging material

Title (en)

Tear strip with security feature, production method and its use in packaging material

Title (de)

Aufreissstreifen mit Sicherheitsmerkmal, ein Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung sowie dessen Verwendung in Verpackungsmaterial

Title (fr)

Bande de déchirement avec fonction de sécurité, méthode de fabrication et son utilisation dans des matériaux d'emballage

Publication

EP 1050485 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109026 A

Priority

DE 19920357 A

Abstract (en)

The pull-open strip with security marking, consisting of a thermoplastic carrier foil covered on one side with a sealing lay and on the other side possibly with a release layer, is characterized by the fact that the carrier foil is printed on one side w a security dye. An Independent claim is also included for a method which involves steps of printing with a security dye and subsequent application of a sealing layer for producing such a strip, and its application for production of a packaging foil.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Aufreißstreifen mit Sicherheitsmerkmal aus einer Trägerfolie, auf die auf der einen Seite eine Siegelschicht und auf der anderen Seite gegebenenfalls eine Release-Schicht aufgetragen ist, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Trägerfolie auf einer Seite mit einer Sicherheitsfarbe bedruckt ist. Ebenfalls beschrieben wird ein Verfahren zur Herstellung dieses Aufreißstreifens sowie dessen Verwendung in Verpackungsmaterial.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/66; B41M 3/14; G09F 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B44F 1/12 (2006.01); B65D 65/34 (2006.01); B65D 75/66 (2006.01); G09F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2013.01); B65D 75/66 (2013.01); G09F 3/0292 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0084 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050485 A1 20001108; CN 1272443 A 20001108; DE 19920357 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011221

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WIPAK WALSRODE GMBH & CO. KG

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI