Global Patent Index - EP 1050490 A1

EP 1050490 A1 2000-11-08 - Container with gravity operated lock

Title (en)

Container with gravity operated lock

Title (de)

Container mit Schwerkraftschloss

Title (fr)

Récipient avec serrure actionné par gravité

Publication

EP 1050490 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108193 A

Priority

DE 19920329 A

Abstract (en)

The container (1) has a main body (6) and a preferably swing-lid, with a lock (5) which is connected to a bolt arrangement ( which can be deactivated without contact. The bolt arrangement has a protuberance especially on the lid, and a thrust piece form part of a bolt-plate, especially on the main body. The bolt arrangement is outside the main body especially in a separate housin the side walls (6a)at the front near the top rim.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft Container (1) mit abschließbarem Deckel (2), deren Verriegelung auch bei gesperrtem Schloß (5) beim Kippen und Entleeren des Behälters automatisch kontaktlos deaktiviert werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/16; E05B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/16 (2006.01); E05B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/0093 (2013.01); B65F 1/1615 (2013.01); B65F 2001/1692 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050490 A1 20001108; DE 19920329 A1 20001130; DE 19920329 C2 20030227

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033824

2005-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040825

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI