Global Patent Index - EP 1050498 A2

EP 1050498 A2 2000-11-08 - Method and device for separating and supplying box blanks

Title (en)

Method and device for separating and supplying box blanks

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vereinzelung und Bereitstellung von Faltschachtelzuschnitten

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour séparer et alimenter des ébauches de boite

Publication

EP 1050498 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108999 A

Priority

DE 19920072 A

Abstract (en)

The magazine (1) ending in first and second stops (11,12) conveys the stacked blanks for the folding boxes (5,6) towards the stops at right angles to their main plane.. A transverse conveyor in the magazine's end part is for the front blank (5), with a space (18) near the second stop (12) for temporarily dipping the transversely-conveyed front blank. The front blank is removed n the stops . The first stop (11) acts as transverse conveyor; the second stop and the free space hold the front blank in a curved position resulting from gravitational force and or conveyor pressure.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren und einer Vorrichtung zur Vereinzelung und Bereitstellung von Faltschachtelzuschnitten (5, 6) werden diese in einem Magazin (1) im Stapel etwa senkrecht zu ihrer Haupterstreckungsebene (7) gegen an parallelen Seitenkanten (9, 10) des jeweils vordersten Faltschachtelzuschnitts (5) angreifende erste und zweite Anschläge (11, 12) nachgefördert. Der jeweils vorderste Faltschachtelzuschnitt (5) wird zunächst in der Haupterstreckungsebene (7) von dem ersten Anschlag (11) in Richtung auf den zweiten Anschlag (12) quergefördert, so daß er von dem ersten Anschlag (11) freikommt und quer zum Stapel versetzt in einen im Bereich des zweiten Anschlages (12) vorgesehenen Freiraum (18) eintaucht und so freigestellt wird. Daraufhin wird der jeweils vorderste Faltschachtelzuschnitt (5) aus der freigestellten Stellung im Bereich der Anschläge (11, 12) abgenommen. Die nachfolgenden Faltschachtelzuschnitte (6) werden von den Anschlägen (11, 12) zurückgehalten. Der so quergeförderte Faltschachtelzuschnitt (5) wird einseitig im Bereich zwischen dem zweiten Anschlag und dem Freiraum gehalten und durch Schwerkrafteinwirkung und/oder Förderdruck in einen gebogenen Zustand überführt und aus dem gebogenen Zustand abgenommen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/08; B65H 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/18 (2006.01); B65H 3/08 (2006.01); B65H 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/185 (2013.01); B65H 3/0858 (2013.01); B65H 3/24 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4234 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050498 A2 20001108; EP 1050498 A3 20010926; EP 1050498 B1 20030730; DE 19920072 A1 20001116; US 6357623 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100428

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100428

2010-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KLOCKNER MEDIPAK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100430

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031018

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003064 P 20030904

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB LI

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE GB LI

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 3/08 A, 7B 65H 3/24 B, 7B 65B 43/18 B

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB LI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI