Global patent index - EP 1050500 A3

EP 1050500 A3 2001-04-25 - Device for centring and widening of a fabric strip

Title (en)

Device for centring and widening of a fabric strip

Title (de)

Zentrier- und Ausbreitvorrichtung einer Textilbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le centrage et l'élargissement d'une bande de tissu

Publication

EP 1050500 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00108609 A

Priority

IT TO990347 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1050500A2] Centring/widening device adapted to widen and centre a fabric strip on a reference axis, consisting of two parallel tubes (41, 42) which are separated between them and face each other, for their entire length, by a part of their wall which presents nozzles adapted for the blowing in of pressured air sent through said tubes by a fan. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/34; B65H 23/032; D06C 3/00; D06H 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/022 (2006.01); B65H 23/032 (2006.01); D06H 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06H 7/08 (2013.01); B65H 23/022 (2013.01); B65H 23/032 (2013.01); D06C 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050500 A2 20001108; EP 1050500 A3 20010425; IT 1307253 B1 20011030; IT TO990347 A1 20001030; IT TO990347 D0 19990428

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIANCO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI