Global Patent Index - EP 1050507 A1

EP 1050507 A1 2000-11-08 - Fragrance diffusion in elevator appliances

Title (en)

Fragrance diffusion in elevator appliances

Title (de)

Dufterzeugung in Aufzugsanlagen

Title (fr)

Diffusion de parfum dans des installations d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 1050507 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109298 A

Priority

  • EP 00109298 A
  • EP 99810397 A

Abstract (en)

The one or more perfume-generators (12) emit perfumes into the vicinity of one or more lift shafts depending on various circumstances such as passengers' predelictions, destinations, time of day or season, air quality and so forth. The perfumes are released via outlet nozzles (13) with sensors (21) detecting people's presence, in portions in small quantities covering small a and lasting only for a few seconds. The areas include the cabins (5), storeys (16) and lift-shaft doors.(17)

Abstract (de)

Aufzugsanlagen sind mit Einrichtungen (12) zur Freisetzung von Duftstoffen in Aufzugskabinen und auf den Stockwerkfluren ausgerüstet. Jede der Dufterzeugungseinrichtungen (12) kann, kontrolliert mittels steuerbarer Ventile, mehrere unterschiedliche Düfte und Gerüche freisetzen, wobei die Duftaustrittsdüsen (13) in einer limitierten Entfernung von der Einrichtung angeordnet sein können. Die Geruchstoffe werden portionenweise in derart geringen Mengen freigesetzt, dass diese nur in einem Umkreis von max. etwa 0,5 m um die Austrittsdüse wahrnehmbar sind und diese Wahrnehmbarkeit nur für einige Sekunden anhält. Dies ermöglicht, in einer Aufzugskabine (5) oder auf einem Stockwerkflur zu gleicher Zeit an verschiedenen Düsen (13) unterschiedliche Düfte und Gerüche freizusetzen, ohne dass diese sich gegenseitig überlagern oder negativ beeinflussen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 432 (M - 1175) 5 November 1991 (1991-11-05)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 138 (M - 1573) 8 March 1994 (1994-03-08)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 527 (M - 1484) 22 September 1993 (1993-09-22)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 11 26 December 1995 (1995-12-26)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050507 A1 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030823

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030410

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010419

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI