Global Patent Index - EP 1050591 A2

EP 1050591 A2 2000-11-08 - Thermal treatment process for manufacturing surface hardened unalloyed or low alloyed, elongated or flat steel products

Title (en)

Thermal treatment process for manufacturing surface hardened unalloyed or low alloyed, elongated or flat steel products

Title (de)

Wärmebehandlungsverfahren zur Herstellung randschichtgehärteter Lang- und Flachprodukte aus unlegierten oder niedriglegierten Stählen

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement thermique pour la fabrication de produits durcis superficiellement, allongés ou plats, en acier non-allié ou faiblement allié

Publication

EP 1050591 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108714 A

Priority

DE 19921286 A

Abstract (en)

In the heat treatment process for the production of edge layer hardened strip and sheet non-alloy and low-alloy steel, the initial cooling process is in a number of steps. Each process step applies a cooling to a temperature below the martensite start temperature to give a martensite change only over a part of the edge zone. A following timed phase relaxes the section which has already had a martensite structure and/or the combined edge zone to give a martensite/austenite composition.

Abstract (de)

Um Wärmebehandlungsverfahren zur Herstellung randschichtgehärteter Lang- oder Flachprodukte, umfassend die Schritte Abkühlen des Werkstücks auf eine Temperatur unterhalb der Martensitstarttemperatur und nachfolgendem langsamen Abkühlen des Kerns dahingehend zu verbessern, daß die Zähigkeitseigenschaften des Werkstücks verbessert werden, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, daß der erste Abkühlprozeß in mehreren, sich wiederholenden Schritten durchgeführt wird, wobei sich jeder Prozeßschritt aus einem Abkühlen auf eine Temperatur unterhalb der Martensitstarttemperatur zur martensitischen Umwandlung nur jeweils eines Teils des Werkstückrandbereichs und einer sich anschließenden zeitlichen Phase zur Entspannung der bereits gebildeten martensitischen Gefügteteile und/oder Randbereiche Martensit/Austenit zusammensetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 1/19; C21D 1/06; C21D 1/78; C21D 8/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 6/00 (2006.01); C21D 1/02 (2006.01); C21D 1/06 (2006.01); C21D 1/19 (2006.01); C21D 8/08 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/08 (2013.01); C21D 1/02 (2013.01); C21D 1/19 (2013.01); C21D 2221/10 (2013.01); Y10S 148/902 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050591 A2 20001108; EP 1050591 A3 20040623; DE 19921286 A1 20001109; JP 2000328141 A 20001128; US 6355119 B1 20020312

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041224

2005-04-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-03-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 21D 1/19 A

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 21D 1/06 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 21D 8/08 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 21D 1/78 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 21D 1/02 -

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI