Global patent index - EP 1050619 A1

EP 1050619 A1 2000-11-08 - Automatic lint filter cleaning device for laundry drier

Title (en)

Automatic lint filter cleaning device for laundry drier

Title (de)

Automatisch zu reinigende Flusenfiltereinrichtung für Haushaltwäschetrockner

Title (fr)

Filtre à bourre auto-nettoyant pour sèche-linge

Publication

EP 1050619 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108555 A

Priority

DE 19919407 A

Abstract (en)

The movement path of the element (2) is crossed twice by the air current and the filter element (3) is placed at the first intersection point. In the filter phase, the filter element (3) is located at the first intersection point between the air current (S) and the movement path. The circulating element section (4) located at the second intersection in the filter phase is designed in such a that few or no lint flies remain hanging from it. The filter element (3) is moved past a lint fly removal unit (3) in a cleaning phase.

Abstract (de)

Ein automatisches Flusenfilter 1 für einen Luftstrom S weist ein endloses Umlaufelement 2 mit einem Filterelement 3 auf, das zum Entfernen der Flusen 5 an einer Vorrichtung 6 zum Abnehmen der Flusen 5 vorbeibewegt wird. Dabei wird das endlose Umlaufelement 2 vom Luftstrom S zweimal durchströmt, einmal von außen nach innen und ein zweites Mal von innen nach außen. Um zu verhindern, daß die Flusen 5, die beim ersten Durchströmen des Umlaufelements 2 nicht zurückgehalten werden konnten, sich beim zweiten Hindurchströmen innen am Umlaufelement 2 absetzen, ist nur der Abschnitt des Umlaufelements 2 mit dem Filterelernent 3 belegt, der in Filterstellung des Umlaufelements 2 beim ersten Mal vom Luftstrom S durchströmt wird. Der andere Abschnitt 3 des Umlaufelements 2, der erst beim zweiten Mal vom Luftstrom S durchströmt wird, ist dagegen so ausgebildet, daß keine oder nur wenig Flusen an ihm hängenbleiben können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 58/22; B01D 46/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19919407 A1 20001102; EP 1050619 A1 20001108; EP 1050619 B1 20030910

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50003606

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150402

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-04 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20091101

2009-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-04-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003606

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020704

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE GB LI NL

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI