Global Patent Index - EP 1050620 A3

EP 1050620 A3 2001-04-25 - Device for controlling the position of a tubular fabric during cutting

Title (en)

Device for controlling the position of a tubular fabric during cutting

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Überwachung der Position von Schlauchwaren während des Schneidevorgangs

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler la position d'un tissu tubulaire pendant la coupe

Publication

EP 1050620 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00108608 A

Priority

IT TO990346 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1050620A2] Device for centring a tubular fabric on the cutting tool, adapted for a cutting machine of the type implementing motor barrels which rotate on their axis and are controlled by photoelectric cells positioned along the advance path of the fabric and located inside the tube formed by the fabric, being in contact with it and associated to a motor fan adapted to blow air inside said tube in order to stretch and widen it; it consists of a single barrel (20) the side wall of which (23) is provided, along its whole circumference with through slots (25), adapted to put the outer surface in communication with means that suck air towards the inner part of the barrel (20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06H 7/08; B65H 23/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06H 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06H 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050620 A2 20001108; EP 1050620 A3 20010425; IT 1308462 B1 20011217; IT TO990346 A1 20001030; IT TO990346 D0 19990428

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030621

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIANCO S.P.A.

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI