Global Patent Index - EP 1050621 A2

EP 1050621 A2 2000-11-08 - Device for treating a web

Title (en)

Device for treating a web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le traitement d'une bande

Publication

EP 1050621 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104997 A

Priority

DE 19921202 A

Abstract (en)

In the assembly to handle a moving fiber web (14), of paper or cardboard, it is carried together with a porous supporting blanket (16) over the perforated mantle (18) of a suction roller (10) as a pick-up and/or transfer roller. The porous blanket (16) is between the roller (10) and the web (14) as they pass round the roller. The roller (10) has inner suction zones (24,26) at the e (A) and exit (B) sections of the roller. The suction zone (24) at the entry (A) is linked to a vacuum source (22). At the exit ( from the roller (10), the web path is followed by an outer suction box (12) or tube, to hold the web at the second suction zone which acts on it, with vacuum from the entry zone (24) linked to the vacuum source (22). At least one intermediate suction zone (28) is between the leading and trailing suction zones (24,26) in the direction (L) web travel. The intermediate suction zone(s) (28) together with the trailing suction zone (26) are linked to the leading suction zon (24) for vacuum from the vacuum supply (22). The intermediate suction zone(s) (28) and/or the trailing suction zone (26) are subjected to vacuum at least partially through the evacuated mantle openings (40). The leading suction zone (24), in the directi (L) of web travel, is linked to the following suction zone through at least one and pref. variable throttle point (42). A pref. variable throttle connection is between the trailing suction zone (26) and the preceding intermediate zone(s) (28). The suction zones (24,26,28) each form suction chambers, open towards the perforated roller mantle (18), with sealing bars (32,34,36,38) bet them and between the static inner suction box (20) and the roller mantle (18). A gap is formed to give the throttle point (42) between the leading suction zone (24) at the web entry section (A) and the following intermediate suction zone (28). The web hol box (12) has a trough shape, open to the suction roller (10), with a defining seal (50) at least at the trailing suction zone (2 At the trailing end of the web holding box (12), in the direction (L) of web travel, the gap between it and the web supporting blanket (16) is sealed by a non-contact seal (52) or sealing lip. The underpressure within the web holding box (12) is set by pr a vacuum breaker and especially a vacuum throttle flap. An outlet (54) at the bottom of the web holding box (12) is for the esca of soiled water, leading into an outflow pipe which opens into a lower water trap. The support belt (16) is a porous blanket. Th upper blanket (44) is separated from the web (14) at the entry section (A) of the suction roller (10). The suction roller (10) i located between two presses (46,56).

Abstract (de)

In einer Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Materialbahn 14 wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn ist die Materialbahn 14 zusammen mit einem porösen Stützband 16 über eine insbesondere als Pick-up- und/oder Transferwalze dienende, einen gelochten Mantel 18 aufweisende Saugwalze 10 geführt, wobei das poröse Stützband 16 im Bereich der Saugwalze 10 zwischen dieser und der Materialbahn 14 liegt. Die Saugwalze 10 weist sowohl im Auflaufbereich A als auch im Ablaufbereich B der Materialbahn 14 jeweils eine an die Innenseite des gelochten Walzenmantels 18 angrenzende Saugzone 24 bzw. 26 auf, wobei die im Ablaufbereich A vorgesehene Saugzone 24 mit einer Vakuumquelle 22 verbunden ist, ein im Anschluß an den Ablaufbereich B angeordneter äußerer Bahnhaltekasten 12 oder Rohrsauger über die im Ablaufbereich B vorgesehene Saugzone 26 besaugt ist und die diese den Bahnhaltekasten 12 bzw. den Rohrsauger beaufschlagende, im Ablaufbereich B vorgesehene Saugzone 26 über die im Auflaufbereich A vorgesehene, mit der Vakuumquelle 22 verbundene Saugzone 24 mit Vakuum beaufschlagt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 2/00; D21F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01); D21F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/045 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01); D21F 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050621 A2 20001108; EP 1050621 A3 20010328; US 6328194 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051005

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI