Global Patent Index - EP 1050625 A3

EP 1050625 A3 2001-12-12 - Device for smoothing the surface of poured concrete

Title (en)

Device for smoothing the surface of poured concrete

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Glätten von Betonoberflächen

Title (fr)

Machine de lissage de surfaces en béton

Publication

EP 1050625 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99811037 A

Priority

CH 87399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CH689868A5] The device is based around a vibrating electric motor (3) which is attached to its chassis in such a way as to transmit vibrations to it. One or more handles (4a) are attached at one end of the chassis to allow it to be maneuvered, and a reversible extended handle may be attached to allow movement from a distance. The motor is fitted with a control device which allows the frequency of its vibrations to be varied selectively. The electrical supply to the motor is controlled by a switch, and is in the range between 200 and 400V. The motor is reversible in its direction of operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/38; E04F 21/24; E04G 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/38 (2006.01); E04G 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/38 (2013.01); E04G 21/066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

CH 689868 A5 19991231; EP 1050625 A2 20001108; EP 1050625 A3 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-10-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI