Global Patent Index - EP 1050626 A2

EP 1050626 A2 2000-11-08 - Apparatus for support and suspension of a snowplough blade

Title (en)

Apparatus for support and suspension of a snowplough blade

Title (de)

Trag- und Aufhängevorrichtung für den Raumschild eines Schneepfluges

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support et de suspension pour une lame de chasse-neige

Publication

EP 1050626 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00109096 A

Priority

IT BO990212 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for support and suspension of a snowplough blade includes a structure (35) fastened to a fore part of a vehicle. The apparatus includes also means for supporting the blade, first power means (70), which cooperate with the supporting means, so as to lower and raise the blade, thus defining the blade two external positions, use and non-use, respectively. Second power means (90) change the inclination of the blade with respect to the vehicle movement direction. Stabilizing means stabilize the blade in the non-use position. The supporting means include at least one upper arm (36), which is connected to the structure (35) and the blade (40). Stabilizing means include an extension (82), extending from the upper arm and turned upwards, and a plate (80), which is fastened to the structure and which forms a seat (81) firmly coupling with the extension (82) after the blade has reached its non-use position (I). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0362837 A2 19900411 - SCHMIDT ALFRED ING GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050626 A2 20001108; EP 1050626 A3 20020814; EP 1050626 B1 20060301; DE 60026192 D1 20060427; DE 60026192 T2 20061123; IT 1309691 B1 20020130; IT BO990212 A1 20001106; IT BO990212 D0 19990504

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60026192

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140526

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140526

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-06-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60026192

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2014-06-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60026192

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENTANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2014-05-30 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 20090416

2009-05-22 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60026192 P 20060427

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040528

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030210

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI