Global Patent Index - EP 1050635 A3

EP 1050635 A3 2002-11-06 - Garden shed

Title (en)

Garden shed

Title (de)

Gartenhaus

Title (fr)

Maison de jardin

Publication

EP 1050635 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00108327 A

Priority

DE 19920566 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19920566C1] In the structure of a garden house, the upper planks (21) of each side wall extend over the upper end of the upright post (1) on their vertical extension. Each upper plank (21) is secured to each upper plank of the adjacent side wall by a locking unit (3), with a flat section which is at a gap (h) from the upper flat surface of the post (1) and parallel to it. A drilling is at the upper flat surface of the post (1), within its contour, to take a threaded spindle (4) which is locked into the post (1) below its upper surface. A nut (41) is screwed on to the spindle (4) over the flat locking section. A spring (42) is between the nut (41) and the facing side of the flat locking section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/70 (2006.01); E04H 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/702 (2013.01); E04H 1/1205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19920566 C1 20001019; EP 1050635 A2 20001108; EP 1050635 A3 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020507

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI