Global Patent Index - EP 1050636 A2

EP 1050636 A2 2000-11-08 - Modular wooden construction elements system with wooden frame elements and their manufacturing process

Title (en)

Modular wooden construction elements system with wooden frame elements and their manufacturing process

Title (de)

Modulares Bau-Teilsystem aus Holz mit Rahmenelement aus Holz und derer Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Système modulaire d'éléments de construction en bois avec des cadres en bois et leur procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1050636 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109074 A

Priority

SI 9900107 A

Abstract (en)

The modular structural part system is for the construction of outer and dividing walls, ceilings and floor constructions and constructing buildings. It is wood with wooden frame components. In the event of wall usage, the longitudinally connected board components of the same width represent the basic frame (1) are provided with an outside layer (5) of heat insulation, a first la (4) of adhesive with a steel grid and a second layer (3) of adhesive as well as a facade cladding (2). On the inside, the board components are equipped with plaster cardboard plates (6) fixed to the sub-construction. The doors windows are formed with outer and inner boards and provided with all apertures for electrical installations.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf modulare Bau-Teilsysteme mit Holzrahmenelement und derer Herstellungsverfahren, welches die Erzeugung von kompletten vorgefertigten Bau-Teilsystemen (z.B. Außen- und Innenwände, Decken und Bodenkonstruktionen) für Aufbau von Gebäuden ermöglicht. Die modularen Bau-Teilsysteme aus Holz gemäß vorliegender Erfindung sind aus dem Rahmenelement aus Holz, bestehend aus horizontal liegenden und miteinander verleimten Brettelementen gleicher Breite, das mit entsprechender Wärme- und Schalldämmung versehen ist. Den modularen Bau-Teilsysteme aus Holz mit Rahmenelement aus Holz, die als Wand oder Boden/Deckenkonstruktion verwendbar sind, liegt das Holzsystem, bestehend aus miteinander in Höhe verleimten Brettelementen, zugrunde, wobei dieses Holzrahmenelement an einer oder beiden Seiten mit Wärme- und/oder Schalldämmung versehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/70; E04C 2/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/10 (2006.01); E04C 2/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/12 (2013.01); E04B 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050636 A2 20001108; EP 1050636 A3 20011004; SI 20282 A 20001231

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020313

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 2/70 A, 7E 04C 2/12 B, 7E 04B 1/10 B, 7B 27M 1/08 B

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI