Global Patent Index - EP 1050639 A2

EP 1050639 A2 2000-11-08 - Method and apparatus for forming a transversal seam by adhesive and/or weldable tape for protecting buildings

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for forming a transversal seam by adhesive and/or weldable tape for protecting buildings

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ausbilden einer Quernaht bei Schweiss- und Klebebahnen für Verwahrungszwecke von Bauten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour former un joint transversal par bandes adhésives et/ou soudables pour la protection de bâtiments

Publication

EP 1050639 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109056 A

Priority

DE 19920472 A

Abstract (en)

A surfacing of sand or grit covers the entire length of the band continuously. Its other, plain side is for adhesion (cold bonding) or thermal welding. During manufacture, the surfacing and a little of the background are removed as a transverse strip, during or in connection with cutting the band to length, at the winding support. An Independent claim is included for corresponding equipment comprising a clamp (4) for the band (1) and the cutting machin (8) removing the seaming strip. Preferred features: Removal of material is by a cutting tool (11), adjustable to vary the thickness the layer removed. The cutter is a milling tool, preferably a plain milling cutter, face milling cutter, diagonal milling cutter end milling cutter and/or high pressure water cutter.

Abstract (de)

Mit der Erfindung werden ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Ausbilden eines Quernahtstreifens bei Schweiß- und Klebebahnen für Verwahrungszwecke von Bauten, insbesondere bei Dachbahnen, die zumindest einseitig eine Schweiß- oder Klebeschicht, vorzugsweise aus Bitumen und/oder Polymerbitumen, aufweisen, und welche mit einer Bestreuung versehen sind, zur Verfügung gestellt. Das Verfahren zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß die Bestreuung über die gesamte Länge der Schweiß- oder Klebebahn ohne Unterbrechung in der Längsrichtung direkt auf die Schweiß- oder Klebebahn aufgebracht wird und bei der Konfektionierung der Schweiß- oder Klebebahn die Bestreuung zusammen mit einem Teil von deren Untergrund, der vorzugsweise Bitumen und/oder Polymerbitumen ist, im Quernahtstreifenbereich gleichzeitig oder in Verbindung mit dem Ablängen der Schweiß- oder Klebebahn am Wickelbock entfernt wird. Die Vorrichtung nach der Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß parallel zu einer Ablängvorrichtung für die Schweiß- oder Klebebahnen eine Klemmvorrichtung zum Einklemmen einer Schweiß- oder Klebebahn und eine Materialabtragungsvorrichtung für die materialabtragende Bearbeitung eines Quernahtstreifens der Schweiß- oder Klebebahn vorgesehen sind, wobei die Materialabtragungsvorrichtung bevorzugt eine Fräsvorrichtung ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 5/12; D06N 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050639 A2 20001108; EP 1050639 A3 20010530; DE 19920472 A1 20001109; DE 19920472 C2 20030206

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041116

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04D 5/12 A, 7D 06N 5/00 B, 7D 21J 1/20 B

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI