Global Patent Index - EP 1050640 A3

EP 1050640 A3 2001-03-21 - Vehicle door handle

Title (en)

Vehicle door handle

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugtürgriff

Title (fr)

Poignée de porte de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1050640 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00109653 A

Priority

IT TO990382 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1050640A2] A handle (1) for a vehicle door has a supporting structure (2); a transmission lever (20) activated externally by means of a control member (16) to rotate between an angular rest position, and an angular work position to open a lock on the door; and a safety locking device (30) for keeping the lever (20) in the rest position in the event of lateral impact on the vehicle; the device (30) has a fixed appendix (9) integral with the structure (2), a movable appendix (27) integral with the lever (20), and a pendulum-type inertial body (31) hinged to the structure (2) about an axis (15) and having an end tongue (37) for making the appendixes (9, 27) integral with each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 7/00; E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 1/00 (2006.01); B60J 5/00 (2006.01); B60J 5/04 (2006.01); B60R 21/00 (2006.01); B60R 21/02 (2006.01); E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/16 (2013.01); E05B 77/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050640 A2 20001108; EP 1050640 A3 20010321; EP 1050640 A9 20010502; EP 1050640 B1 20061011; DE 60031195 D1 20061123; DE 60031195 T2 20070809; ES 2273632 T3 20070516; IT 1309803 B1 20020130; IT TO990382 A1 20001107; IT TO990382 D0 19990507; JP 2001012114 A 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-25 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 60031195

- Effective date: 20110825

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-06-29 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-29 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-04-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VALEO S.P.A.

2011-03-01 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60031195

2011-03-01 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 60031195

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100512

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100622

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH. & CO. KG.

- Effective date: 20070711

2007-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2273632 T3

2007-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60031195 P 20061123

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2006-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031009

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-05-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: VALEO SICUREZZA ABITACOLO S.P.A.

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 65/20 A, 7E 05B 7/00 B, 7E 05B 65/12 B

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI